PA HR391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the weeks of August 25, 2013, through August 30, 2013, and September 2, 2013, through September 6, 2013, as "Back to School Weeks" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the weeks of August 25, 2013, through August 30, 2013, and September 2, 2013, through September 6, 2013, as "Back to School Weeks" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - House - UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Adopted (201-0) |
2013-06-24 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |