PA HR348 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Amended and Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Amended and Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the issue of specialty tier prescription drug pricing in Pennsylvania.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study the issue of specialty tier prescription drug pricing in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Amended and Adopted (199-0) |
2014-02-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to HEALTH |