PA HR248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing October 15, 2023, as "White Cane Safety Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing October 15, 2023, as "White Cane Safety Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |