PA HR248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to ratify the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement on Trade.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to ratify the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement on Trade.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Keller [R] | Rep. Michael Turzai [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] |
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HR 248 PN 1853 (Y: 108 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HR 248 PN 1853, MOT POSTPONE, DERMODY (Y: 86 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01233 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HR 248 PN 1853, MOT POSTPONE, DERMODY (Y: 86 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01233 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-20 | House | Adopted (108-84) |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |