PA HR236 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-08 - Adopted
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-08 - Adopted
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of May 21 through 25, 2007, as "Charcot-Marie-Tooth Association Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
A Resolution designating the week of May 21 through 25, 2007, as "Charcot-Marie-Tooth Association Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-08 | Adopted | |
2007-05-03 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1478 | |
2007-05-01 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1470 | |
2007-04-23 | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=236 |