PA HR216 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-07-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-07-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution memorializing Congress to designate September 11 as "National Emergency Responders' Day," declaring September 11 as "Pennsylvania Emergency Responders' Day" and recognizing emergency responders for their valuable service.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution memorializing Congress to designate September 11 as "National Emergency Responders' Day," declaring September 11 as "Pennsylvania Emergency Responders' Day" and recognizing emergency responders for their valuable service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-08 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-07-05 | Adopted | |
2007-06-27 | Removed from table | |
2007-06-27 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-05 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-18 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=216 |