PA HR193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study on the mental health care provider shortage in this Commonwealth and to issue a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study on the mental health care provider shortage in this Commonwealth and to issue a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HR 193 PN 1814 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01250 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseAdopted (196-0)
2019-05-14HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=193
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0193&pn=1189
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0193&pn=1814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=349

Bill Comments

feedback