PA HR190 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating September 18, 2023, as "Pitt Hopkins Syndrome Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to coincide with "International Pitt Hopkins Syndrome Awareness Day."
Title
Designating September 18, 2023, as "Pitt Hopkins Syndrome Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to coincide with "International Pitt Hopkins Syndrome Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-09-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-08-29 | House | Referred to HEALTH |