PA HR19 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life and legacy of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., and recognizing the week of January 18 through 24, 2021, as "Martin Luther King, Jr., Week of Remembrance" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Honoring the life and legacy of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., and recognizing the week of January 18 through 24, 2021, as "Martin Luther King, Jr., Week of Remembrance" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |