PA HR189 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Adopted (126-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Adopted (126-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the President of the United States and the Congress of the United States to take measures to increase America's long-term energy affordability and security by ensuring the continued operation and expansion of our oil and gas infrastructure.
Title
Urging the President of the United States and the Congress of the United States to take measures to increase America's long-term energy affordability and security by ensuring the continued operation and expansion of our oil and gas infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HR 189 PN 2879 (Y: 126 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Adopted (126-76) |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |