PA HR174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Adopted (200-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Adopted (200-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a thorough and comprehensive study on the cost of implementing a safety plan for staffing of State correctional institutions on Level 3 and Level 4 housing units in this Commonwealth.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a thorough and comprehensive study on the cost of implementing a safety plan for staffing of State correctional institutions on Level 3 and Level 4 housing units in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HR 174 PN 3616 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HR 174 PN 2793, 2021 A5764 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HR 174 PN 2793, 2021 A5764 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | House | Adopted (200-1) |
2022-10-26 | House | Amended (200-1) |
2022-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |