PA HR17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution requesting the Congress of the United States to urge the Food and Drug Administration to reverse its directive allowing OxyContin to be prescribed to children 11 to 16 years of age.
Title
Requesting the Congress of the United States to urge the Food and Drug Administration to reverse its directive allowing OxyContin to be prescribed to children 11 to 16 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2018-02-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-12 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-01-23 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |