PA HR140 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to defeat H.R. 707 and any other legislation which would prohibit states from authorizing and conducting Internet gaming.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to defeat H.R. 707 and any other legislation which would prohibit states from authorizing and conducting Internet gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-10 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-05 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-07 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |