PA HR1078 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - Adopted, Sept. 26, 2018 193-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - Adopted, Sept. 26, 2018 193-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 10, 2018, as "Put the Brakes on Fatalities Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating October 10, 2018, as "Put the Brakes on Fatalities Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Adopted, Sept. 26, 2018 193-0) |
2018-09-24 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |