PA HB996 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for access to long-term care facilities for members of the clergy, for additional safety requirements for residents, for suspension of access for members of the clergy and for personal protective equipment for members of the clergy.
Title
Providing for access to long-term care facilities for members of the clergy, for additional safety requirements for residents, for suspension of access for members of the clergy and for personal protective equipment for members of the clergy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 996 PN 1617, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 996 PN 1414, 2021 A1024, DAVANZO (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00873 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 996 PN 1617, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 996 PN 1414, 2021 A1024, DAVANZO (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00873 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |