PA HB995 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, establishing the PA VETConnect Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Department of Military Affairs, establishing the PA VETConnect Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 995 PN 1011, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-13SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2022-01-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2022-01-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-11-09SenateFirst consideration
2021-11-09SenateReported as amended
2021-06-11SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-08HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-23HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=995
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0995&pn=1011
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0995&pn=2381
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0995P1011.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0995P2381.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=451
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=595
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=315

Bill Comments

feedback