PA HB993 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Labor and Industry to collect fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Labor and Industry to collect fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 993 PN 1628, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01007 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2021-06-14SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-06-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-09HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-08HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-26HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-26HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-26HouseReported as amended
2021-03-23HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=993
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0993&pn=1009
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0993&pn=1628
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0993P1628.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=487
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=488
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=331
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/14/2021&RollCallId=615

Bill Comments

feedback