PA HB991 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 991 PN 1122, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-04-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-08HouseReported as committed
2019-03-27HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback