PA HB986 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 7 (Banks and Banking) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for mortgage loan business prohibitions.
Title
Further providing for mortgage loan business prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - House - HB 986 PN 1139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2009-04-29 | In the Senate | |
2009-04-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-28 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-23 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-23 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-22 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-22 | First consideration | |
2009-04-22 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to COMMERCE |