PA HB984 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for operational provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for operational provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 984 PN 1806, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01332 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01332 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-18SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-17SenateReported as amended
2017-07-14SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-07-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-07-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-30HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-28HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-28HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as amended
2017-03-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=984
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0984&pn=1145
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0984&pn=1806
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0984&pn=2596
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=426
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=481

Bill Comments

feedback