PA HB984 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, further providing, in Allegheny Regional Asset District, for governing board and for capital budget.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, further providing, in Allegheny Regional Asset District, for governing board and for capital budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-27 | First consideration | |
2007-06-27 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=984 |