PA HB983 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in alimony and support, further providing for alimony pendente lite, counsel fees and expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In alimony and support, further providing for alimony pendente lite, counsel fees and expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 983 PN 2743, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 983 PN 2743, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03097 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 102
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-3)
2018-09-24SenateRemoved from table
2018-09-24SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as committed
2017-12-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as amended
2017-03-28HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=983
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0983&pn=1144
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0983&pn=2743
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1074
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1075
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1124
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=889
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=730

Bill Comments

feedback