PA HB980 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.
Title
Providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Floor: HB 980 PN 2153, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00651 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A00651 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - House - House Floor: HB 980 PN 2153, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00651 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A00651 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-09-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-09-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-09-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-09-11 | House | Second consideration |
2017-09-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |