PA HB979 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-2)
Status: Vetoed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Veto No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition; and, in preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition; and, in preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.

Sponsors

Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]
Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Torren Ecker [R]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]
Rep. George Dunbar [R]Sen. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. David Rowe [R]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Rich Irvin [R]
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Sen. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Dan Moul [R]
Rep. Timothy O'Neal [R]Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]
Rep. Stephanie Borowicz [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. Marci Mustello [R]
Rep. James Struzzi [R]Rep. Brian Smith [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Joe Hamm [R]
Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Michael Puskaric [R]
Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Carl Metzgar [R]Rep. Joshua Kail [R]
Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]Rep. Timothy Bonner [R]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]
Rep. Andrew Lewis [R]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Pam Snyder [D]Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]
Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Michael Peifer [R]Rep. Robert Brooks [R]
Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Mike Armanini [R]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]
Rep. Kate Klunk [R]Rep. Jack Rader [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]Rep. Eric Davanzo [R]
Sen. Tracy Pennycuick [R]Rep. Perry Stambaugh [R]Rep. Jason Silvis [R]Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]
Rep. Parke Wentling [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Joe Kerwin [R]
Rep. Clinton Owlett [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Barbara Gleim [R]
Rep. Bradley Roae [R]Rep. Ann Flood [R]

Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 979 PN 1706, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 979 PN 1706, 2021 A34540, COLLETT Amendment No. A-3454 (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03435 (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 979 PN 1706, FP (Y: 124 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 979 PN 991, 2021 A1080, FRANKEL (Y: 76 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 979 PN 991, 2021 A1199, DOWLING (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03SenateVeto No. 3
2022-02-03SenateVetoed by the Governor
2022-01-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2022-01-26SenateSigned in Senate
2022-01-26SenateSigned in House
2022-01-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (32-17)
2022-01-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2022-01-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-24SenateSecond consideration
2022-01-19SenateFirst consideration
2022-01-19SenateReported as committed
2021-06-09SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (124-79)
2021-06-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-05-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-25HouseReported as committed
2021-03-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=979
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0979&pn=0991
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0979&pn=1706
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0979P1706.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0979P1706.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=460
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=276
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=277
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=294
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/08/2021&RollCallId=568
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=434
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=435
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=01/19/2022&RollCallId=750
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=01/19/2022&RollCallId=749
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/24/2022&RollCallId=762

Bill Comments

feedback