PA HB978 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 978 PN 989, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2022-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |