PA HB975 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, further providing for the offense of institutional sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, further providing for the offense of institutional sexual assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 975 PN 1418, FP (Y: 170 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00882 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (170-32)
2021-06-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-04HouseReported as amended
2021-03-18HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=975
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0975&pn=0984
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0975&pn=1418
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0975P1418.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/04/2021&RollCallId=381
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/04/2021&RollCallId=382
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=364

Bill Comments 750

feedback