PA HB965 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for repayments to State Gaming Fund.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for repayments to State Gaming Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: To Table (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00979 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00938 (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: To Table (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00979 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00938 (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |