PA HB952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 53825, on that portion of State Route 1011, also known as Castile Run Road, over the South Fork Tenmile Creek between Jefferson Township and Clarksville Borough, Greene County, as the PFC Brent A. McClellan Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 53825, on that portion of State Route 1011, also known as Castile Run Road, over the South Fork Tenmile Creek between Jefferson Township and Clarksville Borough, Greene County, as the PFC Brent A. McClellan Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 952 PN 1111, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19SenateLaid on the table
2017-06-14SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-14SenateReported as committed
2017-06-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2017-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-23HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-08HouseReported as committed
2017-03-27HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=952
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0952&pn=1111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=491
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=280

Bill Comments

feedback