PA HB951 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time, further providing for infancy, insanity or imprisonment; in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity; waiving sovereign immunity and governmental immunity; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In limitation of time, further providing for infancy, insanity or imprisonment; in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity; waiving sovereign immunity and governmental immunity; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 951 PN 1158, FP (Y: 149 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 951 PN 959, 2021 A670, B. MILLER (Y: 64 N: 137 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 951 PN 959, 2021 A669, ROWE (Y: 109 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 951 PN 959, 2021 A648, GREGORY (Y: 148 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-25SenateLaid on the table
2021-06-08SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-08SenateLaid on the table
2021-04-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-21SenateReported as amended
2021-04-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (149-52)
2021-04-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-17HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=951
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0951&pn=0959
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0951&pn=1158
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0951&pn=1335
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0951P1158.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=235
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=136
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=137
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=138
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=151
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=04/21/2021&RollCallId=122

Bill Comments 750

feedback