PA HB944 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for agricultural education and providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence.
Title
In terms and courses of study, further providing for agricultural education and providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 1967, FP (Y: 188 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01761 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 1967, FP (Y: 188 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01761 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-3) |
2017-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |