PA HB943 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-22)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for consumer prescription drug pricing disclosure and pharmacy freedom to communicate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consumer prescription drug pricing disclosure and pharmacy freedom to communicate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 943 PN 4053, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 943 PN 4053, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 943 PN 2089, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01815 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 67
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-13HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-13HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-07HouseSigned in House
2020-07-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-07-07HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-07-07HouseReferred to RULES
2020-06-30HouseIn the House
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-29SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-04-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-29SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-28SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-28SenateReported as amended
2019-11-22SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-11-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-11-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as amended
2019-04-29HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=943
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0943&pn=1587
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0943&pn=2089
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0943&pn=3655
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0943&pn=4053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=674
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/20/2019&RollCallId=1431
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=897
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=04/28/2020&RollCallId=837
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1019
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=571
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2335

Bill Comments

feedback