PA HB941 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 949, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-19SenateSecond consideration
2021-09-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-09-21SenateReported as committed
2021-06-11SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-08HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-17HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=941
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=0949
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0941P0949.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=450
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=314
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=594
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=09/21/2021&RollCallId=468

Bill Comments

feedback