PA HB941 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board; in organization, further providing for advisory boards and commissions; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for distillery of historical significance license fee reduction; providing for race horse industry reform; conferring duties upon the Joint State Government Commission; making editorial changes; and making related repeals.
Title
In organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board; in organization, further providing for advisory boards and commissions; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for distillery of historical significance license fee reduction; providing for race horse industry reform; conferring duties upon the Joint State Government Commission; making editorial changes; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, CONCUR (Y: 137 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, 2015 A5202, SUSP RULES, PASHINSKI (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05174 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05096 (Y: 1 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05163 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05096 (Y: 1 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05163 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05174 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 2649, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 1244, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, CONCUR (Y: 137 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 2662, 2015 A5202, SUSP RULES, PASHINSKI (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05174 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05096 (Y: 1 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05163 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05096 (Y: 1 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05163 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A05174 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-13 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 2649, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 1244, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Act No. 7 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (48-0) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-12-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (137-60) |
2015-12-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2015-12-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-12-10 | House | In the House |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-2) |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2015-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |