PA HB940 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 60 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 60 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 35 (Health and Safety), 42 (Judiciary and Judiciary Procedure) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for definitions, for the offense of burglary and for the offense of criminal trespass; in cruelty to animals, further providing for police animals; in emergency medical services system, providing for injured police animals; in immunities generally, further providing for emergency response provider and bystander good Samaritan civil immunity; and, in employees, providing for canine training standards for police officers.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for definitions, for the offense of burglary and for the offense of criminal trespass; in cruelty to animals, further providing for police animals; in emergency medical services system, providing for injured police animals; in immunities generally, further providing for emergency response provider and bystander good Samaritan civil immunity; and, in employees, providing for canine training standards for police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 3285, CONCUR (Y: 147 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 940 PN 3285, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 1725, FP (Y: 145 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1468, STEPHENS (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1370, FARRY (Y: 152 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 3285, CONCUR (Y: 147 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 940 PN 3285, Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 1725, FP (Y: 145 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1468, STEPHENS (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1370, FARRY (Y: 152 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 60 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (147-53) |
2022-07-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-06 | House | In the House |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-18) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (145-56) |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |