PA HB939 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 939 PN 1419, FP (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 939 PN 1308, 2021 A808, KLUNK (Y: 119 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00741 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2021-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (111-90)
2021-05-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-21HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as amended
2021-03-17HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=939
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0939&pn=0947
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0939&pn=1308
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0939&pn=1419
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0939P1419.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=310
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=311
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=179
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/05/2021&RollCallId=409
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=216

Bill Comments

feedback