PA HB938 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for nondisclosure agreements relating to sexual harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for nondisclosure agreements relating to sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 938 PN 946, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2021-05-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-05-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-04HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-03-17HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback