PA HB932 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-06 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 29 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-06 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for responsibilities of department and State Board of Education.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for responsibilities of department and State Board of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-06 | Removed from table | |
2007-06-04 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-04 | First consideration | |
2007-06-04 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=932 |