PA HB930 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for schedule of compensation.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for schedule of compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 930 PN 964, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 112 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 930 PN 964, 2023 A309 (Y: 86 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 930 PN 964, 2023 A310 (Y: 92 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00226 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00224 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00259 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00230 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 930 PN 964, 2023 A309 (Y: 86 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 930 PN 964, 2023 A310 (Y: 92 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00226 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00224 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00259 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00230 (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2023-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (112-88) |
2023-05-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-01 | House | Second consideration |
2023-04-26 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |