PA HB927 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1988 (P.L.556, No.101), known as the Municipal Waste Planning, Recycling and Waste Reduction Act, in recycling and waste reduction, further providing for municipal implementation of recycling programs.
Title
In recycling and waste reduction, further providing for municipal implementation of recycling programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 927 PN 1080, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 927 PN 1080, FP (Y: 141 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 927 PN 1080, FP (Y: 141 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 101 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-15) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (141-57) |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |