PA HB926 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the duration of grants.
Title
Further providing for the duration of grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |