PA HB924 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for living donor protection; and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Insurance Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for living donor protection; and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Insurance Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 924 PN 2005, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 924 PN 1803, 2019 A1409, TOOHIL (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A01357 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Health: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as amended
2019-04-09HouseRe-referred to INSURANCE
2019-04-09HouseReported with request to re-refer to INSURANCE
2019-03-20HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=924
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0924&pn=1038
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0924&pn=1803
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0924&pn=2005
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=238
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=498
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=345
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=642

Bill Comments

feedback