PA HB92 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-12)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 6, 1987 (P.L.381, No.79), known as the Older Adults Protective Services Act, further providing for the definition of "exploitation."
Title
Further providing for the definition of "exploitation."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-09 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |