PA HB914 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in storm sewers and watercourses, further providing for authority of boroughs and for manner of financing work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In storm sewers and watercourses, further providing for authority of boroughs and for manner of financing work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 914 PN 1945, FP (Y: 138 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 914 PN 1068, 2017 A1520, MUSTIO (Y: 103 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-04-17SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-17SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-30SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-30SenateReported as committed
2017-06-16SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (138-52)
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-03-22HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=914
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0914&pn=1068
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0914&pn=1945
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=438
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=01/30/2018&RollCallId=653

Bill Comments

feedback