PA HB913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adding provisions related to incorporated towns, and providing for storm water management plans and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding provisions related to incorporated towns, and providing for storm water management plans and facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 913 PN 1944, FP (Y: 144 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 913 PN 1713, 2017 A1519, MUSTIO (Y: 110 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00737 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (144-46)
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as amended
2017-03-22HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=913
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0913&pn=1067
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0913&pn=1713
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0913&pn=1944
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=412
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=437
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=564

Bill Comments

feedback