PA HB908 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for automated external defibrillators in State buildings.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for automated external defibrillators in State buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 2322, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 2232, 2023 A2923 (Y: 192 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01957 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 2322, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 2232, 2023 A2923 (Y: 192 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01957 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-02 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-12-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-12-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (166-37) |
2023-12-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2023-10-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-31 | House | First consideration |
2023-10-31 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-07-07 | House | Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-07-07 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |