PA HB908 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2018-02-06HouseReported as committed
2018-02-06HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2997
2018-02-06HouseErroneously Reported as amended
2017-03-21HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback