PA HB908 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-02-06 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2997 |
2018-02-06 | House | Erroneously Reported as amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to FINANCE |