PA HB899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Title
In public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 899 PN 1021, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 899 PN 1021, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2018-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to HEALTH |