PA HB899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 899 PN 1021, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as committed
2017-03-20HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=899
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0899&pn=1021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1312
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1662

Bill Comments

feedback