PA HB89 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in discipline, removal and retirement of judicial officers, further providing for automatic retirement on age.
Title
In discipline, removal and retirement of judicial officers, further providing for automatic retirement on age.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 89 PN 79, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 89 PN 79, FP (Y: 154 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 89 PN 79, FP (Y: 154 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-24 | Senate | Act No. 62 |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-13) |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (154-44) |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-09 | House | Second consideration |
2015-02-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |